House
|
03/25/2024
|
Published 3-23-2024
|
|
|
House
|
03/25/2024
|
Report approved by the Governor on 3-22-2024. 2023 Wisconsin Act 205
|
|
|
House
|
03/18/2024
|
Presented to the Governor on 3-18-2024
|
|
|
House
|
03/15/2024
|
Report correctly enrolled on 3-15-2024
|
|
|
House
|
03/12/2024
|
Received from Senate concurred in
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/12/2024
|
Read a third time and concurred in
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/12/2024
|
Rules suspended to give bill its third reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/12/2024
|
Ordered immediately messaged
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/12/2024
|
Ordered to a third reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/12/2024
|
Read a second time
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/11/2024
|
Placed on calendar 3-12-2024 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1)
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/11/2024
|
Public hearing requirement waived by committee on Senate Organization, pursuant to Senate Rule 18 (1m), Ayes 3, Noes 2
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/11/2024
|
Available for scheduling
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/11/2024
|
Report concurrence recommended by Committee on Labor, Regulatory Reform, Veterans and Military Affairs, Ayes 5, Noes 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/08/2024
|
Executive action taken
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2024
|
Senator Cowles added as a cosponsor
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/06/2024
|
Senators Wanggaard and Carpenter added as cosponsors
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/15/2024
|
Representative Emerson added as a coauthor
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/19/2024
|
Read first time and referred to committee on Labor, Regulatory Reform, Veterans and Military Affairs
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/18/2024
|
Received from Assembly
|
|
|
House
|
01/18/2024
|
Read a third time and passed
|
|
|
House
|
01/18/2024
|
Rules suspended
|
|
|
House
|
01/16/2024
|
Placed on calendar 1-18-2024 by Committee on Rules
|
|
|
House
|
01/16/2024
|
Referred to committee on Rules
|
|
|
House
|
01/16/2024
|
Report passage recommended by Committee on Transportation, Ayes 12, Noes 0
|
|
|
House
|
11/29/2023
|
Representative Tusler added as a coauthor
|
|
|
House
|
10/24/2023
|
Representative Drake added as a coauthor
|
|
|
House
|
10/24/2023
|
Public hearing held
|
|
|
House
|
09/26/2023
|
Fiscal estimate received
|
|
|
House
|
09/08/2023
|
Representative Jacobson added as a coauthor
|
|
|
House
|
08/23/2023
|
Representative Palmeri added as a coauthor
|
|
|
House
|
08/11/2023
|
Read first time and referred to Committee on Transportation
|
|
|
House
|
08/11/2023
|
Introduced
|
|
|