Senate
|
04/15/2024
|
Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
|
|
|
Senate
|
10/18/2023
|
Public hearing held
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/20/2023
|
Read first time and referred to committee on Mental Health, Substance Abuse Prevention, Children and Families
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/15/2023
|
Received from Assembly
|
|
|
House
|
09/14/2023
|
Ordered immediately messaged
|
|
|
House
|
09/14/2023
|
Read a third time and passed, Ayes 62, Noes 35
|
|
|
House
|
09/14/2023
|
Rules suspended
|
|
|
House
|
09/14/2023
|
Ordered to a third reading
|
|
|
House
|
09/14/2023
|
Assembly Amendment 1 adopted
|
|
|
House
|
09/14/2023
|
Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 laid on table, Ayes 61, Noes 35
|
|
|
House
|
09/14/2023
|
Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 offered by Representatives Billings, Goyke, Ratcliff, Myers, C. Anderson, Vining, Jacobson, Palmeri, Emerson, Riemer, Baldeh, Haywood, Hong, Stubbs, Madison, Sinicki, Joers, Ohnstad, Shelton, Bare, Snodgrass, Subeck, Andraca, Clancy, Neubauer, Ortiz-Velez, Moore Omokunde, Considine, Cabrera, Shankland and J. Anderson
|
|
|
House
|
09/14/2023
|
Read a second time
|
|
|
House
|
09/12/2023
|
Placed on calendar 9-14-2023 by Committee on Rules
|
|
|
House
|
09/12/2023
|
Referred to committee on Rules
|
|
|
House
|
09/12/2023
|
Report passage as amended recommended by Committee on Ways and Means, Ayes 8, Noes 4
|
|
|
House
|
09/12/2023
|
Report Assembly Amendment 1 adoption recommended by Committee on Ways and Means, Ayes 10, Noes 2
|
|
|
House
|
09/12/2023
|
Executive action taken
|
|
|
House
|
09/11/2023
|
Report of Joint Survey Committee on Tax Exemptions received
|
|
|
House
|
09/11/2023
|
Executive action taken by joint survey committee on Tax Exemptions
|
|
|
House
|
09/11/2023
|
Fiscal estimate received
|
|
|
House
|
09/08/2023
|
Assembly Amendment 1 offered by Representative Goeben
|
|
|
House
|
09/06/2023
|
Representative Wichgers added as a coauthor
|
|
|
House
|
09/05/2023
|
Senator Ballweg added as a cosponsor
|
|
|
House
|
09/01/2023
|
Read first time and referred to Joint Survey Committee on Tax Exemptions
|
|
|
House
|
09/01/2023
|
Read first time and referred to Committee on Ways and Means
|
|
|
House
|
09/01/2023
|
Introduced
|
|
|