Senate
|
04/15/2024
|
Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
|
|
|
Senate
|
10/18/2023
|
Public hearing held
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/20/2023
|
Read first time and referred to committee on Mental Health, Substance Abuse Prevention, Children and Families
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/15/2023
|
Received from Assembly
|
|
|
House
|
09/14/2023
|
Ordered immediately messaged
|
|
|
House
|
09/14/2023
|
Read a third time and passed, Ayes 61, Noes 36
|
|
|
House
|
09/14/2023
|
Rules suspended
|
|
|
House
|
09/14/2023
|
Ordered to a third reading
|
|
|
House
|
09/14/2023
|
Assembly Amendment 1 adopted
|
|
|
House
|
09/14/2023
|
Read a second time
|
|
|
House
|
09/12/2023
|
Placed on calendar 9-14-2023 by Committee on Rules
|
|
|
House
|
09/12/2023
|
Referred to committee on Rules
|
|
|
House
|
09/12/2023
|
Report passage as amended recommended by Committee on Children and Families, Ayes 8, Noes 4
|
|
|
House
|
09/12/2023
|
Report Assembly Amendment 1 adoption recommended by Committee on Children and Families, Ayes 12, Noes 0
|
|
|
House
|
09/12/2023
|
Executive action taken
|
|
|
House
|
09/07/2023
|
Senator Felzkowski added as a cosponsor
|
|
|
House
|
09/06/2023
|
Representative Wichgers added as a coauthor
|
|
|
House
|
09/05/2023
|
Assembly Amendment 1 offered by Representative Goeben
|
|
|
House
|
09/01/2023
|
Read first time and referred to Committee on Children and Families
|
|
|
House
|
09/01/2023
|
Introduced
|
|
|