House | 04/15/2024 | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 | ||
House | 02/15/2024 | Assembly Substitute Amendment 4 offered by Representatives Madison and Ortiz-Velez | ||
House | 02/15/2024 | Assembly Substitute Amendment 3 offered by Representatives Ohnstad and Clancy | ||
House | 02/13/2024 | Placed on calendar 2-15-2024 by Committee on Rules | ||
House | 02/12/2024 | Referred to committee on Rules | ||
House | 02/12/2024 | Report passage as amended recommended by Committee on State Affairs, Ayes 9, Noes 4 | ||
House | 02/12/2024 | Report Assembly Substitute Amendment 2 adoption recommended by Committee on State Affairs, Ayes 11, Noes 2 | ||
House | 01/24/2024 | Executive action taken | ||
House | 01/19/2024 | Assembly Substitute Amendment 2 offered by Representative Murphy | ||
House | 12/19/2023 | LRB correction (Assembly Substitute Amendment 1) | ||
House | 12/14/2023 | Fiscal estimate received | ||
House | 10/31/2023 | Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 offered by Representative Murphy | ||
House | 09/13/2023 | Public hearing held | ||
House | 09/05/2023 | Read first time and referred to Committee on State Affairs | ||
House | 09/05/2023 | Introduced |