House
|
05/15/2024
|
Failed to pass notwithstanding the objections of the Governor pursuant to Joint Rule 82
|
|
|
House
|
05/14/2024
|
Placed on calendar 5-14-2024 pursuant to Joint Rule 82 (2)(a)
|
|
|
House
|
03/29/2024
|
Report vetoed by the Governor on 3-29-2024
|
|
|
House
|
03/26/2024
|
Presented to the Governor on 3-26-2024
|
|
|
House
|
03/19/2024
|
Report correctly enrolled on 3-19-2024
|
|
|
House
|
03/12/2024
|
Received from Senate concurred in
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/12/2024
|
Read a third time and concurred in, Ayes 22, Noes 10
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/12/2024
|
Rules suspended to give bill its third reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/12/2024
|
Senate Amendment 1 rejected, Ayes 22, Noes 10
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/12/2024
|
Senate Amendment 1 offered by Senators Pfaff, Wirch, Hesselbein, Agard, Carpenter, L. Johnson, Larson, Smith, Spreitzer and Roys
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/12/2024
|
Ordered immediately messaged
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/12/2024
|
Ordered to a third reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/12/2024
|
Read a second time
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/11/2024
|
Placed on calendar 3-12-2024 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1)
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/11/2024
|
Public hearing requirement waived by committee on Senate Organization, pursuant to Senate Rule 18 (1m), Ayes 3, Noes 2
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/26/2024
|
Available for scheduling
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/26/2024
|
Read first time and referred to committee on Senate Organization
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2024
|
Received from Assembly
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2024
|
Read a third time and passed, Ayes 63, Noes 35
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2024
|
Rules suspended
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2024
|
Assembly Amendment 1 adopted
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2024
|
Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 laid on table, Ayes 63, Noes 35
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2024
|
Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 offered by Representative Considine
|
|
|
House
|
02/20/2024
|
Made a special order of business at 10:17 AM on 2-22-2024 pursuant to Assembly Resolution 28
|
|
|
House
|
02/19/2024
|
Referred to committee on Rules
|
|
|
House
|
02/19/2024
|
Report passage as amended recommended by Committee on Transportation, Ayes 9, Noes 4
|
|
|
House
|
02/19/2024
|
Report Assembly Amendment 1 adoption recommended by Committee on Transportation, Ayes 12, Noes 1
|
|
|
House
|
02/14/2024
|
Representative Stubbs withdrawn as a coauthor
|
|
|
House
|
01/30/2024
|
Executive action taken
|
|
|
House
|
01/29/2024
|
Assembly Amendment 2 offered by Representative Considine
|
|
|
House
|
01/23/2024
|
Assembly Amendment 1 offered by Representative Duchow
|
|
|
House
|
12/06/2023
|
Fiscal estimate received
|
|
|
House
|
12/05/2023
|
Public hearing held
|
|
|
House
|
09/05/2023
|
Read first time and referred to Committee on Transportation
|
|
|
House
|
09/05/2023
|
Introduced
|
|
|