House | 04/15/2024 | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 | ||
House | 11/22/2023 | Representative Haywood added as a coauthor | ||
House | 10/24/2023 | Representative Madison added as a coauthor | ||
House | 09/19/2023 | Representative Mursau added as a coauthor | ||
House | 09/18/2023 | Representative Ratcliff added as a coauthor | ||
House | 09/15/2023 | Representative Shankland added as a coauthor | ||
House | 09/08/2023 | Representative Jacobson added as a coauthor | ||
House | 09/08/2023 | Fiscal estimate received | ||
House | 09/06/2023 | Read first time and referred to Committee on Ways and Means | ||
House | 09/06/2023 | Introduced |