House | 04/15/2024 | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 | ||
House | 02/21/2024 | Representative Penterman added as a coauthor | ||
House | 02/20/2024 | LRB correction (Assembly Substitute Amendment 1) | ||
House | 02/06/2024 | Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 offered by Representative Murphy | ||
House | 02/06/2024 | Public hearing held | ||
House | 01/02/2024 | Fiscal estimate received | ||
House | 09/19/2023 | Read first time and referred to Committee on Transportation | ||
House | 09/19/2023 | Introduced |