House | 04/15/2024 | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 | ||
House | 02/20/2024 | Representative Emerson added as a coauthor | ||
House | 10/24/2023 | Representative Madison added as a coauthor | ||
House | 10/13/2023 | Representative C. Anderson added as a coauthor | ||
House | 09/21/2023 | Representative Palmeri added as a coauthor | ||
House | 09/20/2023 | Representative Subeck added as a coauthor | ||
House | 09/19/2023 | Read first time and referred to Committee on Judiciary | ||
House | 09/19/2023 | Introduced |