House | 04/15/2024 | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 | ||
House | 01/19/2024 | Representative Shankland added as a coauthor | ||
House | 01/18/2024 | Laid on the table | ||
House | 01/17/2024 | Representative Emerson added as a coauthor | ||
House | 01/16/2024 | Placed on calendar 1-18-2024 by Committee on Rules | ||
House | 01/16/2024 | Referred to committee on Rules | ||
House | 01/16/2024 | Report passage recommended by Committee on Local Government, Ayes 10, Noes 0 | ||
House | 12/14/2023 | Executive action taken | ||
House | 12/13/2023 | Representative C. Anderson added as a coauthor | ||
House | 11/16/2023 | Public hearing held | ||
House | 11/16/2023 | Representative Maxey added as a coauthor | ||
House | 11/07/2023 | Representative Jacobson added as a coauthor | ||
House | 09/19/2023 | Read first time and referred to Committee on Local Government | ||
House | 09/19/2023 | Introduced |