House | 04/15/2024 | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 | ||
House | 01/25/2024 | Laid on the table | ||
House | 01/23/2024 | Made a special order of business at 10:18 AM on 1-25-2024 pursuant to Assembly Resolution 23 | ||
House | 12/01/2023 | Referred to committee on Rules | ||
House | 12/01/2023 | Report passage as amended recommended by Committee on Sporting Heritage, Ayes 12, Noes 0 | ||
House | 12/01/2023 | Report Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 adoption recommended by Committee on Sporting Heritage, Ayes 12, Noes 0 | ||
House | 11/15/2023 | Executive action taken | ||
House | 11/08/2023 | Public hearing held | ||
House | 11/06/2023 | Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 offered by Representative Summerfield | ||
House | 09/19/2023 | Read first time and referred to Committee on Sporting Heritage | ||
House | 09/19/2023 | Introduced |