House | 04/15/2024 | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 | ||
House | 03/07/2024 | Representative Neubauer added as a coauthor | ||
House | 10/24/2023 | Representative Madison added as a coauthor | ||
House | 10/03/2023 | Representatives Hong and Schutt added as coauthors | ||
House | 09/26/2023 | Fiscal estimate received | ||
House | 09/19/2023 | Read first time and referred to Committee on Labor and Integrated Employment | ||
House | 09/19/2023 | Introduced |