House
|
03/25/2024
|
Published 3-23-2024
|
|
|
House
|
03/25/2024
|
Report approved by the Governor on 3-22-2024. 2023 Wisconsin Act 212
|
|
|
House
|
03/18/2024
|
Presented to the Governor on 3-18-2024
|
|
|
House
|
01/17/2024
|
Report correctly enrolled on 1-17-2024
|
|
|
House
|
01/16/2024
|
Received from Senate concurred in
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/16/2024
|
Read a third time and concurred in
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/16/2024
|
Rules suspended to give bill its third reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/16/2024
|
Ordered immediately messaged
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/16/2024
|
Ordered to a third reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/16/2024
|
Read a second time
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/12/2024
|
Placed on calendar 1-16-2024 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1)
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/12/2024
|
Public hearing requirement waived by committee on Senate Organization, pursuant to Senate Rule 18 (1m), Ayes 5, Noes 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
12/12/2023
|
Available for scheduling
|
|
|
Senate
|
12/12/2023
|
Withdrawn from committee on Insurance and Small Business and rereferred to committee on Senate Organization pursuant to Senate Rule 46(2)(c)
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/21/2023
|
Read first time and referred to committee on Insurance and Small Business
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/15/2023
|
Received from Assembly
|
|
|
House
|
11/14/2023
|
Read a third time and passed
|
|
|
House
|
11/14/2023
|
Rules suspended
|
|
|
House
|
11/14/2023
|
Assembly Amendment 1 adopted
|
|
|
House
|
11/13/2023
|
Representative Gustafson added as a coauthor
|
|
|
House
|
11/09/2023
|
Placed on calendar 11-14-2023 by Committee on Rules
|
|
|
House
|
11/08/2023
|
Referred to committee on Rules
|
|
|
House
|
11/08/2023
|
Report passage as amended recommended by Committee on Insurance, Ayes 8, Noes 0
|
|
|
House
|
11/08/2023
|
Report Assembly Amendment 1 adoption recommended by Committee on Insurance, Ayes 8, Noes 0
|
|
|
House
|
11/02/2023
|
Executive action taken
|
|
|
House
|
10/24/2023
|
Public hearing held
|
|
|
House
|
10/09/2023
|
Fiscal estimate received
|
|
|
House
|
10/09/2023
|
Assembly Amendment 1 offered by Representative Callahan
|
|
|
House
|
09/20/2023
|
Read first time and referred to Committee on Insurance
|
|
|
House
|
09/20/2023
|
Introduced
|
|
|