House
|
12/05/2023
|
Published 12-6-2023
|
|
|
House
|
12/05/2023
|
Report approved by the Governor on 12-5-2023. 2023 Wisconsin Act 41
|
|
|
House
|
11/30/2023
|
Presented to the Governor on 11-30-2023
|
|
|
House
|
11/16/2023
|
Report correctly enrolled on 11-16-2023
|
|
|
House
|
11/16/2023
|
LRB correction (Assembly Amendment 1)
|
|
|
House
|
11/14/2023
|
Action ordered immediately messaged
|
|
|
House
|
11/14/2023
|
Senate Amendment 2 concurred in, Ayes 72, Noes 26
|
|
|
House
|
11/14/2023
|
Senate Amendment 1 concurred in, Ayes 72, Noes 26
|
|
|
House
|
11/14/2023
|
Received from Senate amended and concurred in as amended (Senate Amendment 1 and Senate Amendment 2 adopted)
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/14/2023
|
Ordered immediately messaged, Ayes 26, Noes 7
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/14/2023
|
Read a third time and concurred in as amended, Ayes 19, Noes 14
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/14/2023
|
Rules suspended to give bill its third reading, Ayes 25, Noes 7
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/14/2023
|
Senate Amendment 3 rejected, Ayes 22, Noes 10
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/14/2023
|
Senate Amendment 2 adopted
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/14/2023
|
Senate Amendment 1 adopted
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/14/2023
|
Senate Substitute Amendment 1 rejected, Ayes 30, Noes 3
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/14/2023
|
Senate Amendment 3 offered by Senators Larson, Carpenter and Taylor
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/14/2023
|
Senate Substitute Amendment 1 offered by Senators Larson, Carpenter and Taylor
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/14/2023
|
Senate Amendment 2 offered by Senator Feyen
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/14/2023
|
Ordered to a third reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/14/2023
|
Read a second time
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/13/2023
|
Placed on calendar 11-14-2023 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1)
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/08/2023
|
Report concurrence as amended recommended by Joint Committee on Finance, Ayes 14, Noes 1
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/08/2023
|
Report adoption of Senate Amendment 1 recommended by Joint Committee on Finance, Ayes 15, Noes 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/08/2023
|
Withdrawn from committee on Senate Organization and rereferred to joint committee on Finance pursuant to Senate Rule 46(2)(c)
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/08/2023
|
Available for scheduling
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/08/2023
|
Report concurrence as amended recommended by Committee on Government Operations, Ayes 3, Noes 2
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/08/2023
|
Report adoption of Senate Amendment 1 recommended by Committee on Government Operations, Ayes 5, Noes 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/08/2023
|
Executive action taken
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/07/2023
|
Senate Amendment 1 offered by Senator Feyen
|
|
|
Senate
|
10/25/2023
|
Public hearing held
|
|
|
Senate
|
10/18/2023
|
Read first time and referred to committee on Government Operations
|
|
|
Senate
|
10/17/2023
|
Received from Assembly
|
|
|
House
|
10/17/2023
|
Ordered immediately messaged
|
|
|
House
|
10/17/2023
|
Read a third time and passed, Ayes 69, Noes 27
|
|
|
House
|
10/17/2023
|
Rules suspended
|
|
|
House
|
10/17/2023
|
Assembly Amendment 1 adopted
|
|
|
House
|
10/12/2023
|
Placed on calendar 10-17-2023 by Committee on Rules
|
|
|
House
|
10/12/2023
|
Referred to committee on Rules
|
|
|
House
|
10/12/2023
|
Report passage as amended recommended by Committee on State Affairs, Ayes 13, Noes 1
|
|
|
House
|
10/12/2023
|
Report Assembly Amendment 1 adoption recommended by Committee on State Affairs, Ayes 13, Noes 1
|
|
|
House
|
10/12/2023
|
Fiscal estimate received
|
|
|
House
|
10/12/2023
|
Assembly Amendment 1 offered by Representative Brooks
|
|
|
House
|
09/28/2023
|
Read first time and referred to Committee on State Affairs
|
|
|
House
|
09/28/2023
|
Introduced
|
|
|