House | 04/15/2024 | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 | ||
House | 01/25/2024 | Laid on the table | ||
House | 01/23/2024 | Made a special order of business at 10:19 AM on 1-25-2024 pursuant to Assembly Resolution 23 | ||
House | 01/04/2024 | Referred to committee on Rules | ||
House | 01/04/2024 | Report passage as amended recommended by Committee on Agriculture, Ayes 14, Noes 0 | ||
House | 01/04/2024 | Report Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 adoption recommended by Committee on Agriculture, Ayes 14, Noes 0 | ||
House | 12/07/2023 | Executive action taken | ||
House | 11/21/2023 | Public hearing held | ||
House | 11/08/2023 | Fiscal estimate received | ||
House | 11/07/2023 | Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 offered by Representative Kurtz | ||
House | 09/28/2023 | Read first time and referred to Committee on Agriculture | ||
House | 09/28/2023 | Introduced |