House | 04/15/2024 | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 | ||
House | 02/13/2024 | Laid on the table | ||
House | 02/08/2024 | Placed on calendar 2-13-2024 by Committee on Rules | ||
House | 01/25/2024 | Referred to committee on Rules | ||
House | 01/25/2024 | Report passage recommended by Committee on Labor and Integrated Employment, Ayes 5, Noes 3 | ||
House | 01/16/2024 | Executive action taken | ||
House | 11/16/2023 | Public hearing held | ||
House | 10/16/2023 | Fiscal estimate received | ||
House | 10/09/2023 | LRB correction | ||
House | 09/28/2023 | Read first time and referred to Committee on Labor and Integrated Employment | ||
House | 09/28/2023 | Introduced |