House | 05/22/2024 | Senator Pfaff added as a cosponsor | ||
House | 04/15/2024 | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 | ||
House | 02/14/2024 | Referred to committee on Rules | ||
House | 02/14/2024 | Report passage recommended by Committee on Environment, Ayes 8, Noes 0 | ||
House | 01/11/2024 | Executive action taken | ||
House | 11/30/2023 | Public hearing held | ||
House | 09/29/2023 | Representative J. Anderson added as a coauthor | ||
House | 09/29/2023 | Representative Bare added as a coauthor | ||
House | 09/28/2023 | Read first time and referred to Committee on Environment | ||
House | 09/28/2023 | Introduced |