House | 04/15/2024 | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 | ||
House | 03/07/2024 | Representative Neubauer added as a coauthor | ||
House | 02/20/2024 | Representative Emerson added as a coauthor | ||
House | 10/11/2023 | Representative Subeck added as a coauthor | ||
House | 10/09/2023 | Fiscal estimate received | ||
House | 09/28/2023 | Read first time and referred to Committee on Ways and Means | ||
House | 09/28/2023 | Introduced |