Senate | 04/15/2024 | Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 | ||
Senate | 02/19/2024 | Read first time and referred to committee on Judiciary and Public Safety | ||
Senate | 02/15/2024 | Received from Assembly | ||
House | 02/15/2024 | Ordered immediately messaged | ||
House | 02/15/2024 | Read a third time and passed | ||
House | 02/15/2024 | Rules suspended | ||
House | 02/15/2024 | Ordered to a third reading | ||
House | 02/15/2024 | Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 adopted | ||
House | 02/15/2024 | Read a second time | ||
House | 02/14/2024 | Representative O'Connor added as a coauthor | ||
House | 02/13/2024 | Placed on calendar 2-15-2024 by Committee on Rules | ||
House | 01/18/2024 | Referred to committee on Rules | ||
House | 01/18/2024 | Report passage as amended recommended by Committee on Judiciary, Ayes 5, Noes 1 | ||
House | 01/18/2024 | Report Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 adoption recommended by Committee on Judiciary, Ayes 6, Noes 0 | ||
House | 01/11/2024 | Executive action taken | ||
House | 12/12/2023 | Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 offered by Representative Sortwell | ||
House | 10/23/2023 | Fiscal estimate received | ||
House | 10/19/2023 | Public hearing held | ||
House | 09/28/2023 | Read first time and referred to Committee on Judiciary | ||
House | 09/28/2023 | Introduced |