House | 04/15/2024 | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 | ||
House | 11/03/2023 | Assembly Amendment 3 offered by Representative Sortwell | ||
House | 10/24/2023 | Fiscal estimate received | ||
House | 10/18/2023 | Public hearing held | ||
House | 10/17/2023 | Assembly Amendment 2 offered by Representatives Clancy and Madison | ||
House | 10/17/2023 | Representative Stubbs added as a coauthor | ||
House | 10/17/2023 | Assembly Amendment 1 offered by Representative Sortwell | ||
House | 09/28/2023 | Read first time and referred to Committee on Corrections | ||
House | 09/28/2023 | Introduced |