House
|
05/15/2024
|
Failed to pass notwithstanding the objections of the Governor pursuant to Joint Rule 82
|
|
|
House
|
05/14/2024
|
Placed on calendar 5-14-2024 pursuant to Joint Rule 82 (2)(a)
|
|
|
House
|
01/18/2024
|
Referred to committee on Rules
|
|
|
House
|
12/06/2023
|
Report vetoed by the Governor on 12-6-2023
|
|
|
House
|
11/30/2023
|
Presented to the Governor on 11-30-2023
|
|
|
House
|
10/18/2023
|
Report correctly enrolled on 10-18-2023
|
|
|
House
|
10/18/2023
|
Received from Senate concurred in
|
|
|
Senate
|
10/17/2023
|
Read a third time and concurred in, Ayes 22, Noes 10
|
|
|
Senate
|
10/17/2023
|
Rules suspended to give bill its third reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
10/17/2023
|
Ordered immediately messaged
|
|
|
Senate
|
10/17/2023
|
Ordered to a third reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
10/17/2023
|
Read a second time
|
|
|
Senate
|
10/16/2023
|
Placed on calendar 10-17-2023 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1)
|
|
|
Senate
|
10/16/2023
|
Public hearing requirement waived by committee on Senate Organization, pursuant to Senate Rule 18 (1m), Ayes 5, Noes 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
10/13/2023
|
Available for scheduling
|
|
|
Senate
|
10/13/2023
|
Read first time and referred to committee on Senate Organization
|
|
|
Senate
|
10/12/2023
|
Received from Assembly
|
|
|
House
|
10/12/2023
|
Read a third time and passed, Ayes 63, Noes 35
|
|
|
House
|
10/12/2023
|
Rules suspended
|
|
|
House
|
10/10/2023
|
Referred to calendar of 10-12-2023 pursuant to Assembly Rule 45 (1)
|
|
|
House
|
10/10/2023
|
Report passage recommended by Committee on Health, Aging and Long-Term Care, Ayes 10, Noes 5
|
|
|
House
|
10/10/2023
|
Executive action taken
|
|
|
House
|
10/09/2023
|
Representative Edming added as a coauthor
|
|
|
House
|
10/04/2023
|
Public hearing held
|
|
|
House
|
10/03/2023
|
Senator Testin added as a cosponsor
|
|
|
House
|
09/29/2023
|
Read first time and referred to Committee on Health, Aging and Long-Term Care
|
|
|
House
|
09/29/2023
|
Introduced
|
|
|