Senate
|
04/15/2024
|
Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/15/2024
|
Available for scheduling
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/15/2024
|
Report concurrence recommended by Committee on Shared Revenue, Elections and Consumer Protection, Ayes 4, Noes 1
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/15/2024
|
Executive action taken
|
|
|
Senate
|
12/19/2023
|
Public hearing held
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/21/2023
|
Read first time and referred to committee on Shared Revenue, Elections and Consumer Protection
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/15/2023
|
Received from Assembly
|
|
|
House
|
11/14/2023
|
Ordered immediately messaged
|
|
|
House
|
11/14/2023
|
Representatives Cabrera, Drake and Krug added as coauthors
|
|
|
House
|
11/14/2023
|
Read a third time and passed
|
|
|
House
|
11/14/2023
|
Rules suspended
|
|
|
House
|
11/14/2023
|
Ordered to a third reading
|
|
|
House
|
11/14/2023
|
Assembly Amendment 1 adopted
|
|
|
House
|
11/14/2023
|
Assembly Amendment 2 to Assembly Amendment 1 adopted
|
|
|
House
|
11/14/2023
|
Assembly Amendment 1 to Assembly Amendment 1 adopted
|
|
|
House
|
11/14/2023
|
Read a second time
|
|
|
House
|
11/13/2023
|
Assembly Amendment 2 to Assembly Amendment 1 offered by Representative Zimmerman
|
|
|
House
|
11/09/2023
|
Placed on calendar 11-14-2023 by Committee on Rules
|
|
|
House
|
11/09/2023
|
Referred to committee on Rules
|
|
|
House
|
11/09/2023
|
Report passage as amended recommended by Committee on Consumer Protection, Ayes 7, Noes 0
|
|
|
House
|
11/09/2023
|
Report Assembly Amendment 1 adoption recommended by Committee on Consumer Protection, Ayes 7, Noes 0
|
|
|
House
|
11/09/2023
|
Report Assembly Amendment 1 to Assembly Amendment 1 adoption recommended by Committee on Consumer Protection, Ayes 7, Noes 0
|
|
|
House
|
10/31/2023
|
Assembly Amendment 1 to Assembly Amendment 1 offered by Representative Zimmerman
|
|
|
House
|
10/13/2023
|
Fiscal estimate received
|
|
|
House
|
10/10/2023
|
LRB correction (Assembly Amendment 1)
|
|
|
House
|
10/10/2023
|
Assembly Amendment 1 offered by Representative Zimmerman
|
|
|
House
|
10/05/2023
|
Read first time and referred to Committee on Consumer Protection
|
|
|
House
|
10/05/2023
|
Introduced
|
|
|