House | 04/15/2024 | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 | ||
House | 01/18/2024 | Laid on the table | ||
House | 01/17/2024 | Representative Macco added as a coauthor | ||
House | 01/16/2024 | Placed on calendar 1-18-2024 by Committee on Rules | ||
House | 01/16/2024 | Referred to committee on Rules | ||
House | 01/16/2024 | Report passage as amended recommended by Committee on Consumer Protection, Ayes 6, Noes 3 | ||
House | 01/16/2024 | Report Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 adoption recommended by Committee on Consumer Protection, Ayes 6, Noes 2 | ||
House | 01/11/2024 | Executive action taken | ||
House | 12/18/2023 | Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 offered by Representative Bodden | ||
House | 11/02/2023 | Public hearing held | ||
House | 11/01/2023 | Senator James added as a cosponsor | ||
House | 10/05/2023 | Read first time and referred to Committee on Consumer Protection | ||
House | 10/05/2023 | Introduced |