House
|
05/15/2024
|
Failed to pass notwithstanding the objections of the Governor pursuant to Joint Rule 82
|
|
|
House
|
05/14/2024
|
Placed on calendar 5-14-2024 pursuant to Joint Rule 82 (2)(a)
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2024
|
Report vetoed by the Governor on 3-21-2024
|
|
|
House
|
03/18/2024
|
Presented to the Governor on 3-18-2024
|
|
|
House
|
02/26/2024
|
Report correctly enrolled on 2-26-2024
|
|
|
House
|
02/20/2024
|
Received from Senate concurred in
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/20/2024
|
Read a third time and concurred in, Ayes 22, Noes 10
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/20/2024
|
Rules suspended to give bill its third reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/20/2024
|
Ordered immediately messaged
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/20/2024
|
Ordered to a third reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/20/2024
|
Read a second time
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/19/2024
|
Placed on calendar 2-20-2024 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/06/2024
|
Available for scheduling
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/06/2024
|
Report concurrence recommended by Committee on Government Operations, Ayes 3, Noes 2
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/06/2024
|
Executive action taken
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/01/2024
|
Public hearing held
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/13/2023
|
Read first time and referred to committee on Government Operations
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/10/2023
|
Received from Assembly
|
|
|
House
|
11/09/2023
|
Read a third time and passed
|
|
|
House
|
11/09/2023
|
Rules suspended
|
|
|
House
|
11/08/2023
|
Representative Maxey added as a coauthor
|
|
|
House
|
11/07/2023
|
Placed on calendar 11-9-2023 by Committee on Rules
|
|
|
House
|
11/07/2023
|
Referred to committee on Rules
|
|
|
House
|
11/07/2023
|
Report passage recommended by Committee on Campaigns and Elections, Ayes 5, Noes 3
|
|
|
House
|
11/07/2023
|
Representative Bodden added as a coauthor
|
|
|
House
|
10/30/2023
|
Representative Wichgers added as a coauthor
|
|
|
House
|
10/12/2023
|
Read first time and referred to Committee on Campaigns and Elections
|
|
|
House
|
10/12/2023
|
Introduced
|
|
|