House | 04/15/2024 | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 | ||
House | 06/14/2023 | Representative Jacobson added as a coauthor | ||
House | 06/02/2023 | Representative Steffen added as a coauthor | ||
House | 06/01/2023 | Public hearing held | ||
House | 05/25/2023 | Representative Stubbs added as a coauthor | ||
House | 05/17/2023 | Representative Ratcliff added as a coauthor | ||
House | 05/16/2023 | Representative Moore Omokunde added as a coauthor | ||
House | 03/01/2023 | Representative C. Anderson added as a coauthor | ||
House | 02/20/2023 | Read first time and referred to Committee on Criminal Justice and Public Safety | ||
House | 02/20/2023 | Introduced |