House
|
05/15/2024
|
Failed to pass notwithstanding the objections of the Governor pursuant to Joint Rule 82
|
|
|
House
|
05/14/2024
|
Placed on calendar 5-14-2024 pursuant to Joint Rule 82 (2)(a)
|
|
|
House
|
03/29/2024
|
Report vetoed by the Governor on 3-29-2024
|
|
|
House
|
03/26/2024
|
Presented to the Governor on 3-26-2024
|
|
|
House
|
02/15/2024
|
Report correctly enrolled on 2-15-2024
|
|
|
House
|
02/13/2024
|
Received from Senate concurred in
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/13/2024
|
Read a third time and concurred in, Ayes 22, Noes 10
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/13/2024
|
Rules suspended to give bill its third reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/13/2024
|
Ordered immediately messaged
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/13/2024
|
Ordered to a third reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/13/2024
|
Read a second time
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/09/2024
|
Placed on calendar 2-13-2024 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/09/2024
|
Public hearing requirement waived by committee on Senate Organization, pursuant to Senate Rule 18 (1m), Ayes 3, Noes 2
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/07/2024
|
Report concurrence recommended by Joint Committee on Finance, Ayes 11, Noes 4
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/07/2024
|
Available for scheduling
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/07/2024
|
Executive action taken
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/05/2024
|
Withdrawn from committee on Senate Organization and rereferred to joint committee on Finance pursuant to Senate Rule 46(2)(c)
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/26/2024
|
Read first time and referred to committee on Senate Organization
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/25/2024
|
Received from Assembly
|
|
|
House
|
01/25/2024
|
Read a third time and passed, Ayes 64, Noes 35
|
|
|
House
|
01/25/2024
|
Rules suspended
|
|
|
House
|
01/25/2024
|
Assembly Amendment 2 adopted
|
|
|
House
|
01/23/2024
|
Made a special order of business at 10:20 AM on 1-25-2024 pursuant to Assembly Resolution 23
|
|
|
House
|
01/18/2024
|
Referred to committee on Rules
|
|
|
House
|
01/18/2024
|
Report passage as amended recommended by Committee on Ways and Means, Ayes 8, Noes 4
|
|
|
House
|
01/18/2024
|
Report Assembly Amendment 2 adoption recommended by Committee on Ways and Means, Ayes 8, Noes 4
|
|
|
House
|
12/29/2023
|
Assembly Amendment 2 offered by Representative Schutt
|
|
|
House
|
11/29/2023
|
Public hearing held
|
|
|
House
|
11/27/2023
|
Assembly Amendment 1 offered by Representative Schutt
|
|
|
House
|
10/13/2023
|
Fiscal estimate received
|
|
|
House
|
10/12/2023
|
Read first time and referred to Committee on Ways and Means
|
|
|
House
|
10/12/2023
|
Introduced
|
|
|