House | 04/15/2024 | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 | ||
House | 11/10/2023 | Representative Billings added as a coauthor | ||
House | 11/10/2023 | Representative Madison added as a coauthor | ||
House | 10/26/2023 | Representative Jacobson added as a coauthor | ||
House | 10/19/2023 | Representative Sinicki added as a coauthor | ||
House | 10/12/2023 | Read first time and referred to Committee on Labor and Integrated Employment | ||
House | 10/12/2023 | Introduced |