House | 04/15/2024 | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 | ||
House | 02/20/2024 | Representative Emerson added as a coauthor | ||
House | 10/30/2023 | Fiscal estimate received | ||
House | 10/26/2023 | Representative Jacobson added as a coauthor | ||
House | 10/13/2023 | Representative Subeck added as a coauthor | ||
House | 10/12/2023 | Read first time and referred to Committee on Workforce Development and Economic Opportunities | ||
House | 10/12/2023 | Introduced |