House
|
05/15/2024
|
Failed to pass notwithstanding the objections of the Governor pursuant to Joint Rule 82
|
|
|
House
|
05/14/2024
|
Placed on calendar 5-14-2024 pursuant to Joint Rule 82 (2)(a)
|
|
|
House
|
01/18/2024
|
Referred to committee on Rules
|
|
|
House
|
12/06/2023
|
Report vetoed by the Governor on 12-6-2023
|
|
|
House
|
11/30/2023
|
Presented to the Governor on 11-30-2023
|
|
|
House
|
11/15/2023
|
Report correctly enrolled on 11-15-2023
|
|
|
House
|
11/15/2023
|
LRB correction
|
|
|
House
|
11/14/2023
|
Received from Senate concurred in
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/14/2023
|
Read a third time and concurred in, Ayes 22, Noes 11
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/14/2023
|
Rules suspended to give bill its third reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/14/2023
|
Placed on the foot of the 14th order of business on the calendar of 11-14-2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/14/2023
|
Ordered immediately messaged
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/14/2023
|
Ordered to a third reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/14/2023
|
Read a second time
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/13/2023
|
Placed on calendar 11-14-2023 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1)
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/13/2023
|
Public hearing requirement waived by committee on Senate Organization, pursuant to Senate Rule 18 (1m), Ayes 5, Noes 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/13/2023
|
Available for scheduling
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/13/2023
|
Read first time and referred to committee on Senate Organization
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/10/2023
|
Received from Assembly
|
|
|
House
|
11/09/2023
|
Read a third time and passed
|
|
|
House
|
11/09/2023
|
Rules suspended
|
|
|
House
|
11/09/2023
|
Assembly Amendment 1 adopted
|
|
|
House
|
11/09/2023
|
Assembly Amendment 1 offered by Representative Duchow
|
|
|
House
|
11/08/2023
|
Representative Gustafson added as a coauthor
|
|
|
House
|
11/07/2023
|
Placed on calendar 11-9-2023 by Committee on Rules
|
|
|
House
|
11/06/2023
|
Report passage recommended by Committee on Campaigns and Elections, Ayes 3, Noes 2
|
|
|
House
|
11/02/2023
|
Executive action taken
|
|
|
House
|
11/02/2023
|
Fiscal estimate received
|
|
|
House
|
10/19/2023
|
Public hearing held
|
|
|
House
|
10/17/2023
|
Senators Ballweg and Marklein added as cosponsors
|
|
|
House
|
10/16/2023
|
Read first time and referred to Committee on Campaigns and Elections
|
|
|
House
|
10/16/2023
|
Introduced
|
|
|