Wisconsin 2023 2023-2024 Regular Session

Wisconsin Assembly Bill AB494 Comm Sub / Analysis

                    Wisconsin Legislative Council 
AMENDMENT MEMO 
One Ea st Ma in Stre e t, Suite 401 • Ma dison, W I 53703 • (608) 266-1304 • le g.council@le gis.wisconsin.gov • http://www.le gis.wisconsin.gov/lc 
Memo published: November 13, 2023 	Contact: Peggy Hurley, Senior Staff Attorney  
2023 Assembly Bill 494 
Assembly  
Amendment 1 
2023 ASSEMBLY BILL 494 
2023 Assembly Bill 494 modifies the definition of a person who may receive absentee ballots as an 
“indefinitely confined” voter. Under the bill, a person may apply, on an application form that is separate 
from any other application form, for that status for the purpose of voting absentee if he or she is 
indefinitely confined and cannot travel independently without significant burden because of frailty, 
physical illness, or a disability that is expected to last longer than one year.  
The bill additionally requires a person who applies for the status of an indefinitely confined voter to 
provide proof of identification, if he or she is able to do so, and offers various means of complying with 
this requirement. The bill specifies that municipal clerks must remove the indefinitely confined status 
from a person who votes in person in any election or who fails to vote in a spring or general election for 
which he or she has received a ballot. Additionally, the bill requires the Wisconsin Elections 
Commission to facilitate the removal of the indefinitely confined status of each voter who received that 
status between March 12, 2020, and November 3, 2020. Under the bill, a voter whose indefinitely 
confined status is so removed must submit a new application for indefinitely confined status in order to 
continue automatically receiving absentee ballots. 
Under the bill, a person who makes a false statement for the purpose of qualifying as indefinitely 
confined may be fined not more than $1,000, imprisoned for not more than six months, or both.  
ASSEMBLY AMENDMENT 1 
Assembly Amendment 1 requires the municipal clerk that serves any voter who received the status of 
indefinitely confined between March 12, 2020, and November 3, 2020, and whose status is removed, to 
notify the voter of such removal within five days after the action is taken, if possible. 
BILL HISTORY 
The Assembly Committee on Campaigns and Elections voted to recommend passage of the bill on 
November 6, 2023, by a vote of Ayes, 3; Noes, 2. On November 9, 2023, Assembly Amendment 1 was 
introduced by Representative Duchow and adopted by the Assembly.  
For a full history of the bill, visit the Legislature’s bill history page. 
PJH:jal