House | 04/15/2024 | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 | ||
House | 01/04/2024 | Referred to committee on Rules | ||
House | 01/04/2024 | Report passage recommended by Committee on Campaigns and Elections, Ayes 7, Noes 0 | ||
House | 10/31/2023 | Executive action taken | ||
House | 10/26/2023 | Representative Andraca added as a coauthor | ||
House | 10/23/2023 | Representative Haywood added as a coauthor | ||
House | 10/19/2023 | Public hearing held | ||
House | 10/18/2023 | Read first time and referred to Committee on Campaigns and Elections | ||
House | 10/18/2023 | Introduced |