House | 04/15/2024 | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 | ||
House | 03/14/2023 | Referred to committee on Tourism | ||
House | 03/14/2023 | Read a second time | ||
House | 03/13/2023 | Joint Committee for Review of Administrative Rules report received pursuant to s. 227.26(2)(g), Wisconsin Statutes | ||
House | 03/13/2023 | Fiscal estimate received | ||
House | 03/08/2023 | Placed on calendar 3-14-2023 by Committee on Rules | ||
House | 03/08/2023 | Referred to committee on Rules | ||
House | 03/08/2023 | Report without recommendation pursuant to s. 227.26(2)(h), Wisconsin Statutes, by Committee on Tourism | ||
House | 02/06/2023 | Read first time and referred to Committee on Tourism | ||
House | 02/06/2023 | Introduced |