House | 04/15/2024 | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 | ||
House | 02/07/2024 | Referred to committee on Rules | ||
House | 02/07/2024 | Report passage recommended by Committee on Criminal Justice and Public Safety, Ayes 10, Noes 5 | ||
House | 11/16/2023 | Executive action taken | ||
House | 11/15/2023 | Assembly Amendment 1 offered by Representative Emerson | ||
House | 10/31/2023 | Public hearing held | ||
House | 10/18/2023 | Read first time and referred to Committee on Criminal Justice and Public Safety | ||
House | 10/18/2023 | Introduced |