House
|
04/15/2024
|
Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
|
|
|
House
|
03/13/2024
|
Referred to committee on Rules
|
|
|
House
|
03/13/2024
|
Report passage as amended recommended by Committee on Health, Aging and Long-Term Care, Ayes 15, Noes 0
|
|
|
House
|
03/13/2024
|
Report Assembly Amendment 1 adoption recommended by Committee on Health, Aging and Long-Term Care, Ayes 15, Noes 0
|
|
|
House
|
02/27/2024
|
Representative Joers added as a coauthor
|
|
|
House
|
02/21/2024
|
Representative Moses added as a coauthor
|
|
|
House
|
02/16/2024
|
Representative Ortiz-Velez added as a coauthor
|
|
|
House
|
02/14/2024
|
Executive action taken
|
|
|
House
|
02/12/2024
|
Representative Vining added as a coauthor
|
|
|
House
|
02/05/2024
|
Assembly Amendment 1 offered by Representative VanderMeer
|
|
|
House
|
11/08/2023
|
Public hearing held
|
|
|
House
|
11/03/2023
|
Representative Ratcliff added as a coauthor
|
|
|
House
|
10/26/2023
|
Representative Jacobson added as a coauthor
|
|
|
House
|
10/26/2023
|
Commissioner of Insurance report received pursuant to s.601.423(2), Wisconsin Statutes
|
|
|
House
|
10/18/2023
|
Read first time and referred to Committee on Health, Aging and Long-Term Care
|
|
|
House
|
10/18/2023
|
Introduced
|
|
|