Senate | 04/15/2024 | Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 | ||
Senate | 11/07/2023 | Representative Gustafson added as a coauthor | ||
Senate | 03/15/2023 | Received from Assembly | ||
Senate | 03/15/2023 | Read first time and referred to committee on Education | ||
House | 03/14/2023 | Ordered immediately messaged | ||
House | 03/14/2023 | Read a third time and passed, Ayes 61, Noes 35 | ||
House | 03/14/2023 | Rules suspended | ||
House | 03/14/2023 | Ordered to a third reading | ||
House | 03/14/2023 | Read a second time | ||
House | 03/10/2023 | Representative Knodl added as a coauthor | ||
House | 03/08/2023 | Placed on calendar 3-14-2023 by Committee on Rules | ||
House | 03/08/2023 | Referred to committee on Rules | ||
House | 03/08/2023 | Report passage recommended by Committee on Education, Ayes 9, Noes 5 | ||
House | 03/08/2023 | Executive action taken | ||
House | 03/02/2023 | Public hearing held | ||
House | 03/01/2023 | Fiscal estimate received | ||
House | 02/20/2023 | Introduced |