House | 04/15/2024 | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 | ||
House | 02/20/2024 | Representative Emerson added as a coauthor | ||
House | 02/13/2024 | Representative Madison added as a coauthor | ||
House | 11/08/2023 | Fiscal estimate received | ||
House | 10/26/2023 | Representative Jacobson added as a coauthor | ||
House | 10/18/2023 | Read first time and referred to Committee on Education | ||
House | 10/18/2023 | Introduced |