House | 04/15/2024 | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 | ||
House | 02/14/2024 | Representative Madison added as a coauthor | ||
House | 11/15/2023 | Representative Emerson added as a coauthor | ||
House | 10/31/2023 | Fiscal estimate received | ||
House | 10/19/2023 | Representative Billings added as a coauthor | ||
House | 10/18/2023 | Read first time and referred to Committee on Housing and Real Estate | ||
House | 10/18/2023 | Introduced |