House | 04/15/2024 | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 | ||
House | 02/15/2024 | Laid on the table | ||
House | 02/13/2024 | Placed on calendar 2-15-2024 by Committee on Rules | ||
House | 01/31/2024 | Senator Wanggaard added as a cosponsor | ||
House | 01/18/2024 | Referred to committee on Rules | ||
House | 01/18/2024 | Report passage recommended by Committee on Criminal Justice and Public Safety, Ayes 13, Noes 2 | ||
House | 01/17/2024 | Executive action taken | ||
House | 01/16/2024 | Representative Wichgers added as a coauthor | ||
House | 01/11/2024 | Public hearing held | ||
House | 10/18/2023 | Read first time and referred to Committee on Criminal Justice and Public Safety | ||
House | 10/18/2023 | Introduced |