House | 04/19/2024 | Representative Bare added as a coauthor | ||
House | 04/15/2024 | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 | ||
House | 11/10/2023 | Representative Billings added as a coauthor | ||
House | 11/10/2023 | Representative Madison added as a coauthor | ||
House | 10/24/2023 | Fiscal estimate received | ||
House | 10/18/2023 | Read first time and referred to Committee on Labor and Integrated Employment | ||
House | 10/18/2023 | Introduced |