House | 04/15/2024 | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 | ||
House | 02/20/2024 | Laid on the table | ||
House | 02/20/2024 | Representative Shankland added as a coauthor | ||
House | 02/15/2024 | Placed on calendar 2-20-2024 by Committee on Rules | ||
House | 02/14/2024 | Referred to committee on Rules | ||
House | 02/14/2024 | Report passage as amended recommended by Joint Committee on Finance, Ayes 15, Noes 0 | ||
House | 02/14/2024 | Report Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 adoption recommended by Joint Committee on Finance, Ayes 15, Noes 0 | ||
House | 02/07/2024 | Senator Wimberger added as a cosponsor | ||
House | 02/07/2024 | Executive action taken | ||
House | 02/05/2024 | Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 offered by Representative Kurtz | ||
House | 02/02/2024 | Withdrawn from committee on Colleges and Universities and referred to joint committee on Finance pursuant to Assembly Rule 42 (3)(c) | ||
House | 01/10/2024 | Public hearing held | ||
House | 11/28/2023 | Assembly Amendment 1 offered by Representatives Kurtz, O'Connor and Gundrum | ||
House | 10/27/2023 | Fiscal estimate received | ||
House | 10/25/2023 | Representatives Rozar and Tranel added as coauthors | ||
House | 10/24/2023 | Representative Armstrong added as a coauthor | ||
House | 10/18/2023 | Read first time and referred to Committee on Colleges and Universities | ||
House | 10/18/2023 | Introduced |