House
|
05/15/2024
|
Failed to pass notwithstanding the objections of the Governor pursuant to Joint Rule 82
|
|
|
House
|
05/14/2024
|
Placed on calendar 5-14-2024 pursuant to Joint Rule 82 (2)(a)
|
|
|
House
|
03/29/2024
|
Report vetoed by the Governor on 3-29-2024
|
|
|
House
|
03/26/2024
|
Presented to the Governor on 3-26-2024
|
|
|
House
|
01/17/2024
|
Report correctly enrolled on 1-17-2024
|
|
|
House
|
01/16/2024
|
Received from Senate concurred in
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/16/2024
|
Read a third time and concurred in, Ayes 25, Noes 7
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/16/2024
|
Rules suspended to give bill its third reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/16/2024
|
Ordered immediately messaged
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/16/2024
|
Ordered to a third reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/16/2024
|
Read a second time
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/12/2024
|
Placed on calendar 1-16-2024 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1)
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/12/2024
|
Public hearing requirement waived by committee on Senate Organization, pursuant to Senate Rule 18 (1m), Ayes 5, Noes 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
12/14/2023
|
Available for scheduling
|
|
|
Senate
|
12/14/2023
|
Report concurrence recommended by Committee on Mental Health, Substance Abuse Prevention, Children and Families, Ayes 5, Noes 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
12/13/2023
|
Executive action taken
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/21/2023
|
Read first time and referred to committee on Mental Health, Substance Abuse Prevention, Children and Families
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/15/2023
|
Received from Assembly
|
|
|
House
|
11/14/2023
|
Representative Krug added as a coauthor
|
|
|
House
|
11/14/2023
|
Read a third time and passed
|
|
|
House
|
11/14/2023
|
Rules suspended
|
|
|
House
|
11/14/2023
|
Assembly Amendment 2 adopted
|
|
|
House
|
11/14/2023
|
Assembly Amendment 1 adopted
|
|
|
House
|
11/09/2023
|
Placed on calendar 11-14-2023 by Committee on Rules
|
|
|
House
|
11/09/2023
|
Referred to committee on Rules
|
|
|
House
|
11/09/2023
|
Report passage as amended recommended by Committee on Health, Aging and Long-Term Care, Ayes 10, Noes 5
|
|
|
House
|
11/09/2023
|
Report Assembly Amendment 2 adoption recommended by Committee on Health, Aging and Long-Term Care, Ayes 15, Noes 0
|
|
|
House
|
11/09/2023
|
Report Assembly Amendment 1 adoption recommended by Committee on Health, Aging and Long-Term Care, Ayes 15, Noes 0
|
|
|
House
|
11/09/2023
|
Assembly Amendment 2 offered by Representative Gustafson
|
|
|
House
|
11/08/2023
|
Public hearing held
|
|
|
House
|
11/07/2023
|
Assembly Amendment 1 offered by Representative Gustafson
|
|
|
House
|
11/01/2023
|
Representative Rettinger added as a coauthor
|
|
|
House
|
10/18/2023
|
Read first time and referred to Committee on Health, Aging and Long-Term Care
|
|
|
House
|
10/18/2023
|
Introduced
|
|
|