Senate
|
04/15/2024
|
Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/26/2024
|
Read first time and referred to committee on Education
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2024
|
Received from Assembly
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2024
|
Ordered immediately messaged
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2024
|
Read a third time and passed
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2024
|
Rules suspended
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2024
|
Ordered to a third reading
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2024
|
Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 adopted
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2024
|
Assembly Amendment 3 to Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 adopted
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2024
|
Assembly Amendment 3 to Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 offered by Representative Callahan
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2024
|
Assembly Amendment 2 to Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 adopted
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2024
|
Assembly Amendment 1 to Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 adopted
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2024
|
Read a second time
|
|
|
House
|
02/20/2024
|
Made a special order of business at 10:19 AM on 2-22-2024 pursuant to Assembly Resolution 28
|
|
|
House
|
02/15/2024
|
Placed on calendar 2-20-2024 by Committee on Rules
|
|
|
House
|
02/13/2024
|
Withdrawn from joint committee on Finance and referred to committee on Rules pursuant to Assembly Rule 42 (3)(c)
|
|
|
House
|
01/25/2024
|
Withdrawn from committee on Rules and referred to joint committee on Finance pursuant to Assembly Rule 42 (3)(c)
|
|
|
House
|
01/22/2024
|
Representative Ortiz-Velez added as a coauthor
|
|
|
House
|
01/18/2024
|
Referred to committee on Rules
|
|
|
House
|
01/18/2024
|
Report passage as amended recommended by Committee on Criminal Justice and Public Safety, Ayes 12, Noes 3
|
|
|
House
|
01/18/2024
|
Report Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 adoption recommended by Committee on Criminal Justice and Public Safety, Ayes 15, Noes 0
|
|
|
House
|
01/18/2024
|
Report Assembly Amendment 2 to Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 adoption recommended by Committee on Criminal Justice and Public Safety, Ayes 14, Noes 1
|
|
|
House
|
01/18/2024
|
Report Assembly Amendment 1 to Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 adoption recommended by Committee on Criminal Justice and Public Safety, Ayes 10, Noes 5
|
|
|
House
|
01/17/2024
|
Representative Ortiz-Velez withdrawn as a coauthor
|
|
|
House
|
01/17/2024
|
Executive action taken
|
|
|
House
|
01/16/2024
|
Assembly Amendment 2 to Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 offered by Representative Callahan
|
|
|
House
|
01/11/2024
|
Assembly Amendment 1 to Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 offered by Representative Callahan
|
|
|
House
|
01/09/2024
|
Representative Stubbs added as a coauthor
|
|
|
House
|
11/30/2023
|
Public hearing held
|
|
|
House
|
11/29/2023
|
Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 offered by Representative Callahan
|
|
|
House
|
11/29/2023
|
Fiscal estimate received
|
|
|
House
|
10/18/2023
|
Read first time and referred to Committee on Criminal Justice and Public Safety
|
|
|
House
|
10/18/2023
|
Introduced
|
|
|