House
|
05/15/2024
|
Failed to pass notwithstanding the objections of the Governor pursuant to Joint Rule 82
|
|
|
House
|
05/14/2024
|
Placed on calendar 5-14-2024 pursuant to Joint Rule 82 (2)(a)
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2024
|
Report vetoed by the Governor on 3-21-2024
|
|
|
House
|
03/18/2024
|
Presented to the Governor on 3-18-2024
|
|
|
House
|
01/18/2024
|
Report correctly enrolled on 1-18-2024
|
|
|
House
|
01/16/2024
|
Received from Senate concurred in
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/16/2024
|
Read a third time and concurred in, Ayes 22, Noes 10
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/16/2024
|
Rules suspended to give bill its third reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/16/2024
|
Ordered immediately messaged
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/16/2024
|
Ordered to a third reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/16/2024
|
Read a second time
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/12/2024
|
Placed on calendar 1-16-2024 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1)
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/12/2024
|
Public hearing requirement waived by committee on Senate Organization, pursuant to Senate Rule 18 (1m), Ayes 5, Noes 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/13/2023
|
Available for scheduling
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/13/2023
|
Read first time and referred to committee on Senate Organization
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/10/2023
|
Received from Assembly
|
|
|
House
|
11/09/2023
|
Read a third time and passed
|
|
|
House
|
11/09/2023
|
Rules suspended
|
|
|
House
|
11/09/2023
|
Assembly Amendment 2 adopted
|
|
|
House
|
11/09/2023
|
Assembly Amendment 1 adopted
|
|
|
House
|
11/08/2023
|
Representatives Gustafson and Maxey added as coauthors
|
|
|
House
|
11/07/2023
|
Placed on calendar 11-9-2023 by Committee on Rules
|
|
|
House
|
11/07/2023
|
Referred to committee on Rules
|
|
|
House
|
11/07/2023
|
Report passage as amended recommended by Committee on Campaigns and Elections, Ayes 5, Noes 3
|
|
|
House
|
11/07/2023
|
Report Assembly Amendment 2 adoption recommended by Committee on Campaigns and Elections, Ayes 7, Noes 1
|
|
|
House
|
11/07/2023
|
Report Assembly Amendment 1 adoption recommended by Committee on Campaigns and Elections, Ayes 5, Noes 3
|
|
|
House
|
11/07/2023
|
Representative Bodden added as a coauthor
|
|
|
House
|
11/07/2023
|
Executive action taken
|
|
|
House
|
11/01/2023
|
Assembly Amendment 2 offered by Representative Tittl
|
|
|
House
|
10/31/2023
|
Public hearing held
|
|
|
House
|
10/24/2023
|
Assembly Amendment 1 offered by Representative Tittl
|
|
|
House
|
10/18/2023
|
Read first time and referred to Committee on Campaigns and Elections
|
|
|
House
|
10/18/2023
|
Introduced
|
|
|