Senate
|
04/15/2024
|
Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/09/2024
|
Available for scheduling
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/09/2024
|
Report concurrence recommended by Committee on Economic Development and Technical Colleges, Ayes 5, Noes 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/03/2024
|
Executive action taken
|
|
|
Senate
|
12/06/2023
|
Public hearing held
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/09/2023
|
Read first time and referred to committee on Economic Development and Technical Colleges
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/08/2023
|
Received from Assembly
|
|
|
House
|
11/07/2023
|
Ordered immediately messaged
|
|
|
House
|
11/07/2023
|
Read a third time and passed, Ayes 98, Noes 0
|
|
|
House
|
11/07/2023
|
Rules suspended
|
|
|
House
|
11/07/2023
|
Ordered to a third reading
|
|
|
House
|
11/07/2023
|
Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 adopted
|
|
|
House
|
11/07/2023
|
Read a second time
|
|
|
House
|
11/02/2023
|
Placed on calendar 11-7-2023 by Committee on Rules
|
|
|
House
|
11/02/2023
|
Referred to committee on Rules
|
|
|
House
|
11/02/2023
|
Report passage as amended recommended by Committee on Workforce Development and Economic Opportunities, Ayes 10, Noes 0
|
|
|
House
|
11/02/2023
|
Report Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 adoption recommended by Committee on Workforce Development and Economic Opportunities, Ayes 10, Noes 0
|
|
|
House
|
10/31/2023
|
Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 offered by Representative Michalski
|
|
|
House
|
10/27/2023
|
Fiscal estimate received
|
|
|
House
|
10/27/2023
|
Representative Mursau added as a coauthor
|
|
|
House
|
10/24/2023
|
Representative Rettinger added as a coauthor
|
|
|
House
|
10/20/2023
|
Read first time and referred to Committee on Workforce Development and Economic Opportunities
|
|
|
House
|
10/20/2023
|
Introduced
|
|
|