House
|
03/21/2024
|
Published 3-22-2024
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2024
|
Report approved by the Governor on 3-21-2024. 2023 Wisconsin Act 165
|
|
|
House
|
03/18/2024
|
Presented to the Governor on 3-18-2024
|
|
|
House
|
01/18/2024
|
Report correctly enrolled on 1-18-2024
|
|
|
House
|
01/16/2024
|
Received from Senate concurred in
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/16/2024
|
Read a third time and concurred in
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/16/2024
|
Rules suspended to give bill its third reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/16/2024
|
Ordered immediately messaged
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/16/2024
|
Ordered to a third reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/16/2024
|
Read a second time
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/12/2024
|
Placed on calendar 1-16-2024 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1)
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/09/2024
|
Available for scheduling
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/09/2024
|
Report concurrence recommended by Committee on Economic Development and Technical Colleges, Ayes 5, Noes 1
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/03/2024
|
Executive action taken
|
|
|
Senate
|
12/06/2023
|
Public hearing held
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/09/2023
|
Read first time and referred to committee on Economic Development and Technical Colleges
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/08/2023
|
Received from Assembly
|
|
|
House
|
11/07/2023
|
Read a third time and passed, Ayes 91, Noes 7
|
|
|
House
|
11/07/2023
|
Rules suspended
|
|
|
House
|
11/07/2023
|
Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 adopted
|
|
|
House
|
11/02/2023
|
Placed on calendar 11-7-2023 by Committee on Rules
|
|
|
House
|
11/02/2023
|
Referred to committee on Rules
|
|
|
House
|
11/02/2023
|
Report passage as amended recommended by Committee on Workforce Development and Economic Opportunities, Ayes 9, Noes 1
|
|
|
House
|
11/02/2023
|
Report Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 adoption recommended by Committee on Workforce Development and Economic Opportunities, Ayes 7, Noes 3
|
|
|
House
|
11/01/2023
|
Fiscal estimate received
|
|
|
House
|
10/31/2023
|
Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 offered by Representative Green
|
|
|
House
|
10/24/2023
|
Representatives Brandtjen and Rettinger added as coauthors
|
|
|
House
|
10/24/2023
|
Representative Baldeh withdrawn as a coauthor
|
|
|
House
|
10/20/2023
|
Read first time and referred to Committee on Workforce Development and Economic Opportunities
|
|
|
House
|
10/20/2023
|
Introduced
|
|
|