Senate
|
04/15/2024
|
Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/04/2024
|
Senate Amendment 1 offered by Senator Wimberger
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/31/2024
|
Representative Steffen added as a coauthor
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/31/2024
|
Public hearing held
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/28/2023
|
Fiscal estimate received
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/09/2023
|
Read first time and referred to committee on Universities and Revenue
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/08/2023
|
Received from Assembly
|
|
|
House
|
11/07/2023
|
Ordered immediately messaged
|
|
|
House
|
11/07/2023
|
Read a third time and passed, Ayes 62, Noes 35
|
|
|
House
|
11/07/2023
|
Rules suspended
|
|
|
House
|
11/07/2023
|
Ordered to a third reading
|
|
|
House
|
11/07/2023
|
Assembly Amendment 1 adopted
|
|
|
House
|
11/07/2023
|
Read a second time
|
|
|
House
|
11/06/2023
|
Representative Gustafson added as a coauthor
|
|
|
House
|
11/02/2023
|
Assembly Amendment 1 offered by Representatives Rettinger and Wittke
|
|
|
House
|
11/02/2023
|
Placed on calendar 11-7-2023 by Committee on Rules
|
|
|
House
|
11/02/2023
|
Referred to committee on Rules
|
|
|
House
|
11/02/2023
|
Report passage recommended by Committee on Colleges and Universities, Ayes 10, Noes 4
|
|
|
House
|
11/02/2023
|
Executive action taken
|
|
|
House
|
11/01/2023
|
Senators Felzkowski and Tomczyk added as cosponsors
|
|
|
House
|
10/24/2023
|
Read first time and referred to Committee on Colleges and Universities
|
|
|
House
|
10/24/2023
|
Introduced
|
|
|