House
|
04/15/2024
|
Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
|
|
|
House
|
02/15/2024
|
Laid on the table
|
|
|
House
|
02/14/2024
|
Representatives C. Anderson and Michalski added as coauthors
|
|
|
House
|
02/13/2024
|
Placed on calendar 2-15-2024 by Committee on Rules
|
|
|
House
|
01/04/2024
|
Referred to committee on Rules
|
|
|
House
|
01/04/2024
|
Report passage as amended recommended by Committee on Children and Families, Ayes 12, Noes 0
|
|
|
House
|
01/04/2024
|
Report Assembly Amendment 1 adoption recommended by Committee on Children and Families, Ayes 12, Noes 0
|
|
|
House
|
01/02/2024
|
Representative Allen added as a coauthor
|
|
|
House
|
11/10/2023
|
Representative Bare added as a coauthor
|
|
|
House
|
11/09/2023
|
Executive action taken
|
|
|
House
|
11/08/2023
|
Representatives Emerson and Madison added as coauthors
|
|
|
House
|
11/08/2023
|
Assembly Amendment 1 offered by Representative Snyder
|
|
|
House
|
11/07/2023
|
Representative Shelton added as a coauthor
|
|
|
House
|
11/06/2023
|
Representative Andraca added as a coauthor
|
|
|
House
|
11/02/2023
|
Representative Steffen added as a coauthor
|
|
|
House
|
11/01/2023
|
Public hearing held
|
|
|
House
|
10/30/2023
|
Representative Vining added as a coauthor
|
|
|
House
|
10/27/2023
|
Senator Cabral-Guevara added as a cosponsor
|
|
|
House
|
10/26/2023
|
Read first time and referred to Committee on Children and Families
|
|
|
House
|
10/26/2023
|
Introduced
|
|
|