House | 04/15/2024 | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 | ||
House | 01/25/2024 | Laid on the table | ||
House | 01/23/2024 | Made a special order of business at 10:22 AM on 1-25-2024 pursuant to Assembly Resolution 23 | ||
House | 01/18/2024 | Referred to committee on Rules | ||
House | 01/18/2024 | Report passage as amended recommended by Committee on Consumer Protection, Ayes 9, Noes 0 | ||
House | 01/18/2024 | Report Assembly Amendment 1 adoption recommended by Committee on Consumer Protection, Ayes 8, Noes 0 | ||
House | 01/17/2024 | Executive action taken | ||
House | 01/11/2024 | Public hearing held | ||
House | 12/27/2023 | Fiscal estimate received | ||
House | 12/12/2023 | Assembly Amendment 1 offered by Representative Bodden | ||
House | 10/30/2023 | Representative Subeck added as a coauthor | ||
House | 10/26/2023 | Read first time and referred to Committee on Consumer Protection | ||
House | 10/26/2023 | Introduced |