Senate | 04/15/2024 | Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 | ||
Senate | 11/21/2023 | Read first time and referred to committee on Judiciary and Public Safety | ||
Senate | 11/15/2023 | Received from Assembly | ||
House | 11/14/2023 | Ordered immediately messaged | ||
House | 11/14/2023 | Representative Krug added as a coauthor | ||
House | 11/14/2023 | Read a third time and passed | ||
House | 11/14/2023 | Rules suspended | ||
House | 11/14/2023 | Ordered to a third reading | ||
House | 11/14/2023 | Read a second time | ||
House | 11/13/2023 | Representatives Gustafson and O'Connor added as coauthors | ||
House | 11/10/2023 | Fiscal estimate received | ||
House | 11/09/2023 | Placed on calendar 11-14-2023 by Committee on Rules | ||
House | 11/09/2023 | Referred to committee on Rules | ||
House | 11/09/2023 | Report passage recommended by Committee on Mental Health and Substance Abuse Prevention, Ayes 8, Noes 4 | ||
House | 11/09/2023 | Executive action taken | ||
House | 11/01/2023 | Public hearing held | ||
House | 10/30/2023 | Representative Subeck added as a coauthor | ||
House | 10/27/2023 | Withdrawn from committee on Judiciary and referred to committee on Mental Health and Substance Abuse Prevention pursuant to Assembly Rule 42 (3)(c) | ||
House | 10/26/2023 | Read first time and referred to Committee on Judiciary | ||
House | 10/26/2023 | Introduced |