House | 05/15/2024 | Senator Hesselbein added as a cosponsor | ||
House | 04/15/2024 | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 | ||
House | 01/09/2024 | Public hearing held | ||
House | 12/13/2023 | Representative C. Anderson added as a coauthor | ||
House | 11/13/2023 | Representative Madison added as a coauthor | ||
House | 11/06/2023 | Fiscal estimate received | ||
House | 11/01/2023 | Representative Bare added as a coauthor | ||
House | 10/30/2023 | Representative Emerson added as a coauthor | ||
House | 10/26/2023 | Read first time and referred to Committee on Campaigns and Elections | ||
House | 10/26/2023 | Introduced |