House
|
05/15/2024
|
Failed to pass notwithstanding the objections of the Governor pursuant to Joint Rule 82
|
|
|
House
|
05/14/2024
|
Placed on calendar 5-14-2024 pursuant to Joint Rule 82 (2)(a)
|
|
|
House
|
03/13/2024
|
Referred to committee on Rules
|
|
|
House
|
12/08/2023
|
Representative Gustafson added as a coauthor
|
|
|
House
|
12/06/2023
|
Report vetoed by the Governor on 12-6-2023
|
|
|
House
|
11/30/2023
|
Presented to the Governor on 11-30-2023
|
|
|
House
|
09/15/2023
|
Report correctly enrolled on 9-15-2023
|
|
|
House
|
09/14/2023
|
Action ordered immediately messaged
|
|
|
House
|
09/14/2023
|
Senate Amendment 1 concurred in
|
|
|
House
|
09/14/2023
|
Received from Senate amended and concurred in as amended (Senate Amendment 1 adopted)
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/14/2023
|
Read a third time and concurred in as amended, Ayes 22, Noes 11
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/14/2023
|
Rules suspended to give bill its third reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/14/2023
|
Senate Amendment 1 adopted
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/14/2023
|
Ordered immediately messaged
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/14/2023
|
Ordered to a third reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/14/2023
|
Read a second time
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/12/2023
|
Placed on calendar 9-14-2023 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1)
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/11/2023
|
Senate Amendment 1 offered by Senator Hutton
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/06/2023
|
Available for scheduling
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/06/2023
|
Report concurrence recommended by Committee on Judiciary and Public Safety, Ayes 4, Noes 3
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/05/2023
|
Executive action taken
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/22/2023
|
Public hearing held
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2023
|
Read first time and referred to committee on Judiciary and Public Safety
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2023
|
Received from Assembly
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
Read a third time and passed, Ayes 62, Noes 35
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
Rules suspended
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
Representative O'Connor added as a coauthor
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2023
|
Placed on calendar 3-22-2023 by Committee on Rules
|
|
|
House
|
03/13/2023
|
Report passage recommended by Committee on Judiciary, Ayes 5, Noes 2
|
|
|
House
|
02/20/2023
|
Read first time and referred to Committee on Judiciary
|
|
|
House
|
02/20/2023
|
Introduced
|
|
|